Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL-13]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 02/04/1986
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 02/04/1986
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Carney, William [R-NY-1]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Gradison, Willis D., Jr. [D-OH-2]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Strang, Michael L. [R-CO-3]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17]* 02/04/1986
Rep. O'Brien, George M. [R-IL-4]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3]* 02/04/1986
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 02/18/1986
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 02/18/1986
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/18/1986
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 02/18/1986
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/18/1986
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 02/18/1986
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 02/18/1986
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 02/18/1986
Rep. Wright, James C., Jr. [D-TX-12] 02/18/1986
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4] 02/18/1986
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-42] 02/18/1986
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 02/18/1986
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 02/18/1986
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 02/18/1986
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 02/18/1986
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 02/18/1986
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 02/18/1986
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 02/18/1986
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/18/1986
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 02/18/1986
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 02/18/1986
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/18/1986
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 02/18/1986
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 02/18/1986
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/18/1986
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 02/18/1986
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 02/18/1986
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 02/18/1986
Rep. Broyhill, James T. [R-NC-10] 02/18/1986
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3] 02/18/1986
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 02/18/1986
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 02/18/1986
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 02/19/1986
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 02/19/1986
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 02/19/1986
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 02/19/1986
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 02/19/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 02/19/1986
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 02/26/1986
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 02/26/1986
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 02/26/1986
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 02/26/1986
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 02/26/1986
Rep. Boulter, Beau [R-TX-13] 02/26/1986
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 02/26/1986
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 02/26/1986
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/06/1986
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 03/06/1986
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 03/06/1986
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 03/06/1986
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 03/06/1986
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 03/06/1986
Rep. Cheney, Dick [R-WY-At Large] 03/06/1986
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/06/1986
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4] 03/12/1986
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 03/12/1986
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 03/12/1986
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/20/1986
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 03/20/1986
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 03/20/1986
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 05/14/1986
Rep. Chappie, Eugene A. [R-CA-2] 06/03/1986
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 06/16/1986