Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 06/24/1986
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 06/24/1986
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/24/1986
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 06/24/1986
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/24/1986
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 06/24/1986
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 06/24/1986
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 06/24/1986
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 06/24/1986
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 06/24/1986
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/24/1986
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 06/24/1986
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 06/24/1986
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 06/24/1986
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 06/24/1986
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20] 06/24/1986
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 06/24/1986
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/24/1986
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 06/24/1986
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/24/1986
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 06/24/1986
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 06/24/1986
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 06/24/1986
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 06/24/1986
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 07/16/1986
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/16/1986
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 07/16/1986
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 07/16/1986
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 07/16/1986
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 07/16/1986
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 07/16/1986
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 08/01/1986
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 08/01/1986
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 08/01/1986
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 08/01/1986
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 08/01/1986
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 08/01/1986
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 08/01/1986
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 08/01/1986
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 08/01/1986
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 08/01/1986
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 08/01/1986
Rep. Chappie, Eugene A. [R-CA-2] 08/01/1986
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 08/01/1986
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 08/01/1986
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 08/01/1986
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 08/01/1986
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 08/01/1986
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 08/01/1986
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 08/01/1986
Rep. Franklin, William W. [R-MS-2] 08/01/1986
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 08/01/1986
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 08/01/1986
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 08/01/1986
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 08/12/1986
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 08/12/1986
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 08/12/1986
Rep. Hendon, Bill [R-NC-11] 08/12/1986
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 08/12/1986
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 08/12/1986
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 08/12/1986
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 08/12/1986
Rep. Rudd, Eldon D. [R-AZ-4] 08/12/1986
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 08/12/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 08/12/1986
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 08/12/1986
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 08/12/1986
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 08/12/1986
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 08/12/1986
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 08/12/1986
Rep. Fuqua, Don [D-FL-2] 08/12/1986
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4] 08/12/1986
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 08/12/1986
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9] 08/12/1986
Rep. Eckert, Fred J. [R-NY-30] 08/15/1986
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 08/15/1986
Rep. Mica, Daniel Andrew [D-FL-14] 08/15/1986
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 09/16/1986
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 09/16/1986
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 09/16/1986
Rep. Hopkins, Larry J. [R-KY-6] 09/16/1986
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 09/16/1986
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 09/16/1986
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 09/16/1986
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-31] 09/16/1986
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3] 09/16/1986
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 10/08/1986
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/08/1986
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 10/09/1986