Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 06/11/1985
Rep. Breaux, John B. [D-LA-7]* 06/11/1985
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 06/11/1985
Rep. McCain, John [R-AZ-1]* 06/11/1985
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 06/11/1985
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 06/11/1985
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 06/11/1985
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 06/11/1985
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25]* 06/11/1985
Rep. Lujan, Manuel, Jr. [R-NM-1]* 06/11/1985
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2]* 06/11/1985
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3]* 06/11/1985
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 06/11/1985
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 06/11/1985
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1]* 06/11/1985
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5]* 06/11/1985
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 06/11/1985
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6]* 06/11/1985
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/11/1985
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 06/11/1985
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7]* 06/11/1985
Rep. Jones, James R. [D-OK-1]* 06/11/1985
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 06/11/1985
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 06/11/1985
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 06/27/1985
Rep. Fuqua, Don [D-FL-2] 06/27/1985
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 06/27/1985
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 06/27/1985
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4] 06/27/1985
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 09/11/1985
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 09/11/1985
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 09/11/1985
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 09/11/1985
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 09/20/1985
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 10/01/1985
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 11/06/1985
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 11/06/1985
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 05/13/1986
Rep. Long, Cathy (Mrs. Gillis) [D-LA-8] 05/13/1986
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 08/06/1986