Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (04/05/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Authorizes expenditures by the Senate Committee on the Judiciary from: (1) March 1, 2013, through September 30, 2013; (2) October 1, 2013, through September 30, 2014; and (3) October 1, 2014, through February 28, 2015.