Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/05/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/05/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 03/05/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/05/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/05/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/05/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 03/05/2013
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 03/05/2013
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 03/05/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/05/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/05/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 03/05/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 03/05/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 03/05/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/05/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 03/05/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 03/05/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/05/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 03/05/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/05/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 03/05/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 03/05/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 03/06/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 03/06/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/06/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 03/11/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 03/11/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/11/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/11/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 03/11/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 03/11/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/11/2013
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 03/11/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 03/11/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 03/12/2013
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 03/12/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/12/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/12/2013
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/13/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/13/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 03/13/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/13/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/14/2013
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/14/2013
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/18/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/18/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 03/18/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/18/2013
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 03/18/2013
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 03/18/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 03/19/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/19/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 03/19/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 03/20/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/22/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 04/09/2013
Sen. Cowan, William M. [D-MA] 04/09/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 04/15/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 04/16/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 04/17/2013
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 04/17/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 04/17/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 04/18/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/23/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 04/24/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/24/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 04/24/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 05/07/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/07/2013
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/13/2013