Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 12/11/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 12/12/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 12/12/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 12/12/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 12/13/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 12/17/2013
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 01/09/2014