Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 10/31/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 10/31/2013
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 10/31/2013
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 11/06/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 11/06/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 11/06/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 11/06/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 11/07/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 11/13/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 11/14/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 11/14/2013