Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 10/16/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 10/16/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 10/16/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 10/16/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 10/16/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 10/16/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 10/16/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 10/16/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT]* 10/16/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 10/28/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/29/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 11/12/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 11/18/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/03/2014
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/06/2014