Text: S.Res.225 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

There is one version of the bill.

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (09/12/2013)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF or HTML/XML.




[Congressional Bills 113th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[S. Res. 225 Introduced in Senate (IS)]

113th CONGRESS
  1st Session
S. RES. 225

  To express the sense of the Senate that Congress should establish a 
 joint select committee to investigate and report on the attack on the 
 United States diplomatic facility and American personnel in Benghazi, 
                     Libya, on September 11, 2012.


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                           September 12, 2013

Mr. Cruz (for himself, Mr. Vitter, Mr. Blunt, Mr. Toomey, Mr. Paul, Mr. 
 Scott, Mr. Lee, Mr. Inhofe, Ms. Ayotte, Mr. Portman, Mr. Coburn, Mr. 
 Risch, Mr. Johnson of Wisconsin, Mr. Heller, Mr. Isakson, Mr. Crapo, 
    Mr. Roberts, Mr. Burr, Mr. Graham, Mr. Barrasso, Mr. Enzi, Mr. 
 Grassley, and Mr. Cochran) submitted the following resolution; which 
       was referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
  To express the sense of the Senate that Congress should establish a 
 joint select committee to investigate and report on the attack on the 
 United States diplomatic facility and American personnel in Benghazi, 
                     Libya, on September 11, 2012.

Whereas the September 11, 2012, terrorist attack on the United States diplomatic 
        facility in Benghazi, Libya, resulted in the brutal deaths of four 
        Americans: Ambassador Christopher Stevens, Foreign Service Officer Sean 
        Smith, and former Navy SEALS Glen Doherty and Tyrone Woods;
Whereas the Nation commemorates and mourns the loss of these American heroes;
Whereas Ambassador Christopher Stevens is the first United States ambassador to 
        be murdered since Ambassador Adolph Dubs was kidnapped and killed in 
        Afghanistan in 1979;
Whereas President Barack Obama declared in his first address to the Nation about 
        the attack on September 12, 2012, ``make no mistake, we will work with 
        the Libyan government to bring to justice the killers who attacked our 
        people,'' yet there has been no action of reprisal and no justice 
        rendered;
Whereas failure to hold accountable the perpetrators of this vicious attack will 
        leave terrorists around the world with the impression that they can kill 
        Americans and escape the consequences--increasing the likelihood of 
        future attacks;
Whereas progress in the investigation into the attacks on the United States 
        diplomatic facility has been disappointing, and no suspects are in 
        United States custody;
Whereas whistleblowers, including former Deputy Chief of Mission Gregory Hicks, 
        have reported unwarranted repercussions and fear of retaliation;
Whereas the Department of State's lack of adequate cooperation has prevented 
        congressional committees from properly investigating and receiving 
        direct testimony on behalf of Benghazi survivors;
Whereas the American people deserve to have a complete account from their 
        government of the events in Benghazi before, during, and after the 
        September 11, 2012, attack because, as Gregory Hicks said, ``the 
        American people need to have the story. And Ambassador Chris Stevens, 
        Sean Smith, Ty Woods and Glen Doherty's names are names that should be 
        remembered by every American for the sacrifice that they made.''; and
Whereas the White House declared on September 10, 2013, ``We remain committed to 
        bringing the perpetrators of the Benghazi attacks to justice and to 
        ensuring the safety of our brave personnel serving overseas'': Now, 
        therefore, be it
    Resolved, That it is the sense of the Senate that Congress should 
establish a joint select committee to investigate and report on the 
attack on the United States diplomatic facility and American personnel 
in Benghazi, Libya on September 11, 2012.
                                 <all>