Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 07/30/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 07/30/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 09/11/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 10/02/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 10/30/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 10/31/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 11/13/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 02/26/2014