Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 06/10/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 06/10/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 06/10/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 06/10/2013
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 06/10/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 06/10/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/11/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/19/2013
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/08/2013
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 07/30/2013