Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (03/25/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Declares that when the Senate recesses or adjourns on any day from Friday, March 22, 2013 through Tuesday, March 26, 2013, it stand recessed or adjourned until 12:00 noon on Monday, April 8, 2013.

Declares that when the House adjourns on Monday, March 25, 2013, it stand adjourned until 2:00 p.m. on Tuesday, April 9, 2013.