Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 05/21/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 11/18/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 11/21/2013
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 11/21/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 11/21/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 11/21/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 11/21/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 12/10/2013
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 12/12/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/24/2014