Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/16/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/22/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 05/22/2013
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/03/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/03/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/04/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/04/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 06/06/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 06/10/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 06/10/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/11/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/11/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/11/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/11/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/17/2013
Sen. Cowan, William M. [D-MA] 06/18/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/18/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/19/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/20/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 07/16/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 07/16/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 07/18/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 07/24/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 07/24/2013