Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/23/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/12/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/12/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/23/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 12/10/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 01/15/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/12/2014
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 03/24/2014
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/27/2014
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 04/02/2014