Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Cowan, William M. [D-MA]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 05/09/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/13/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/13/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 05/13/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 05/15/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 05/15/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 05/15/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/20/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/22/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/17/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/17/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/27/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 07/15/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 07/17/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 08/01/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 09/09/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 11/12/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 11/13/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 12/10/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 12/19/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 02/24/2014
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/24/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 03/31/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 04/10/2014