Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 05/15/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/22/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 07/17/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 08/01/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 02/24/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 04/10/2014