Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Cowan, William M. [D-MA]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/17/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/18/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/09/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 12/20/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 01/28/2014