Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/08/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 05/13/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 07/30/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 09/17/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 03/11/2014