Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/14/2013
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/14/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 05/14/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 05/15/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/16/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 05/20/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 05/23/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/03/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/03/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/26/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 10/02/2013