Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 05/08/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 05/08/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/08/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/16/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/03/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/04/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/11/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 06/13/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/18/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 07/08/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/25/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/31/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 09/09/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 09/18/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 12/18/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 12/20/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 02/12/2014