Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 05/07/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 05/07/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 05/07/2013
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN]* 05/07/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC]* 05/07/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND]* 05/07/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 05/07/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 05/07/2013
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 05/07/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 05/07/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 05/07/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 05/08/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 05/09/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/04/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 07/11/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 07/24/2013
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 09/11/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 01/06/2014
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 02/04/2014