Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 05/06/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 05/06/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 05/06/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/06/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 05/06/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/06/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/06/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/06/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/06/2013
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/06/2013
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 05/06/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 05/06/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/06/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 05/06/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/06/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/06/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/06/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 05/06/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 05/06/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 05/06/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 05/06/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/06/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/06/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 05/06/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 05/06/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 05/06/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/06/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/06/2013
Sen. Cowan, William M. [D-MA] 05/06/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 05/06/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/07/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/07/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/07/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 05/07/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/08/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/09/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 05/15/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/15/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/15/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/16/2013
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 05/16/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/22/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/23/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 06/03/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 06/07/2013
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/17/2013
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/18/2013
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/18/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/25/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 09/11/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 10/28/2013
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 11/04/2013