Refine your search

  • S.Amdt.1735 to S.Amdt.1406   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 06/26/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  • S.Amdt.1625 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  • S.Amdt.1526   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  • S.Amdt.1338   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 06/18/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  • S.Amdt.1297   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] (Submitted 06/17/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  • S.Amdt.1262   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] (Submitted 06/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  • S.Amdt.1261   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] (Submitted 06/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 5
  • S.Amdt.1251   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: Requiring Enforcement, Security and safety while Upgrading Lawful Trade and travel Simultaneously (RESULTS).
    Sponsor: Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] (Submitted 06/12/2013) (Proposed 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 15
    Latest Action: 06/20/13 Motion to table amendment SA 1251 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 43. Record Vote Number: 159.
  • S.Amdt.1222   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To apply the amendments made by the Child Citizenship Act of 2000 retroactively to all individuals adopted by a citizen of the United States in an international adoption and to repeal the pre-adoption parental visitation requirement for automatic citizenship and to amend section 320 of the Immigration and Nationality Act relating to automatic citizenship for children born outside of the United States who have a United States citizen parent.
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 06/11/2013) (Proposed 06/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
    Latest Action: 06/18/13 Amendment SA 1222 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.