Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 04/16/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 04/16/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 04/16/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 04/16/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 04/16/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 04/16/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/22/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/23/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/06/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/08/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/09/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/20/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/20/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 06/18/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/20/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 07/10/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 09/24/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 01/16/2014