Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 04/16/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/18/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/23/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 05/07/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/08/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/08/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 05/09/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 05/15/2013
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/16/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 05/16/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 05/22/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 05/22/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/23/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 06/07/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/17/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/24/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/27/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/08/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/18/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 09/17/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 10/29/2013