Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 04/15/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 04/15/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/23/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/23/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/06/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 06/13/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/17/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/23/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 08/01/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 10/30/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 10/30/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 10/30/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 02/04/2014