Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 04/11/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 05/07/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/12/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/18/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/18/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/26/2013