Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/22/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/09/2013
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 05/13/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/14/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/21/2013
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 05/22/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/23/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/03/2013
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 06/03/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/20/2013