Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/22/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 03/22/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 05/06/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/06/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 05/14/2013
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 05/15/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 05/22/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 06/06/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/25/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 08/01/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 09/09/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 09/12/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 09/27/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/27/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 10/01/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 10/15/2013
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 10/29/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 11/06/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 11/06/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 12/19/2013
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 01/07/2014
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 01/07/2014