Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/22/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/22/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/22/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 05/07/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/16/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/16/2013
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 05/21/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/23/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/04/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/11/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 06/18/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/24/2013