Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/20/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/22/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 05/20/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/17/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 10/28/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 02/10/2014