Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/12/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 03/12/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC]* 03/12/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/06/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 07/09/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 10/07/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 03/31/2014
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 04/01/2014