Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 01/22/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 01/23/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 01/23/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 01/23/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 01/23/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 01/23/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 01/23/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 01/23/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 01/23/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 01/23/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 01/23/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 01/23/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 01/23/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 01/24/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 01/24/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 01/24/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 01/24/2013
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 01/28/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 01/28/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 01/28/2013
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 01/28/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 01/28/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 01/28/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 01/28/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 01/28/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 01/28/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 01/28/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 01/28/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 01/28/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 01/28/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 01/28/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 01/28/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 01/28/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 01/28/2013
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 01/28/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 01/29/2013
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 01/29/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 01/29/2013
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 01/29/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 01/30/2013
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 01/31/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 01/31/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 01/31/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 01/31/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/04/2013
Sen. Cowan, William M. [D-MA] 02/07/2013