Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 03/11/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/12/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 03/18/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 04/15/2013