Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/04/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 03/04/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 03/04/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 03/04/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 03/04/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 03/04/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 03/04/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/07/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 03/11/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 03/11/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 04/22/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 04/24/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 04/02/2014