Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 02/28/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 03/04/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 04/08/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/08/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/08/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/19/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/10/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 07/18/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/29/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 09/12/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/17/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/23/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/30/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 10/16/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/07/2014