Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/05/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/05/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 03/07/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/17/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 06/12/2013