Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 02/26/2013
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/26/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/26/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 02/26/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 02/26/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 02/26/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 02/26/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 02/26/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 03/18/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 03/18/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 03/21/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 04/10/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 04/17/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 04/25/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/06/2013
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 05/08/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 05/08/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/13/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 05/16/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 05/20/2013
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/20/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/23/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/04/2013
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 06/27/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 07/25/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/30/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/30/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 07/30/2013
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/31/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 07/31/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 07/31/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/31/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 09/09/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 09/09/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 09/10/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/11/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 09/11/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/11/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/17/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 09/26/2013
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 10/31/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 11/04/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 11/07/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/12/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 11/12/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 11/12/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 11/12/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 11/12/2013
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 11/12/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 11/12/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 11/12/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 11/12/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 11/12/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 11/12/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 11/12/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 11/12/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 11/12/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 11/12/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 11/12/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 11/12/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 11/12/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 11/12/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 11/13/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 11/13/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 11/13/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 11/13/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 11/14/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 11/14/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 11/14/2013
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/14/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 11/14/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 11/18/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 11/18/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/18/2013
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 11/18/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 11/18/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 11/19/2013
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 11/19/2013