Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/13/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 03/07/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/12/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/09/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/24/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 05/07/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/09/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/22/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 05/22/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 06/27/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 07/09/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 07/17/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 07/17/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 08/01/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 08/01/2013