Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 01/22/2013
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 01/23/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 01/24/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 01/24/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 01/28/2013
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 01/28/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 01/28/2013
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 01/30/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 01/30/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 01/30/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 01/30/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 02/04/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 10/28/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 10/29/2013

Show cosponsors who withdrew