Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 02/07/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/10/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/25/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/23/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/23/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 11/05/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 03/31/2014