Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 01/30/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 01/30/2014
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 01/30/2014
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 02/03/2014
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 02/04/2014
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 02/10/2014
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 02/10/2014
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/10/2014
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 02/10/2014
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 02/10/2014
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 02/10/2014
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 02/10/2014
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 02/11/2014
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 02/12/2014
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/24/2014