Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 02/27/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 02/27/2013
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 02/27/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 02/27/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 02/27/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ]* 02/27/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 02/27/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 02/27/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 02/27/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 02/27/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 02/27/2013
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/27/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 02/27/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 02/28/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 03/13/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 03/18/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/22/2013