Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 12/19/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 01/08/2014
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 01/14/2014
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 01/16/2014
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 01/27/2014
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 01/27/2014
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/04/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 02/24/2014
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 02/24/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/04/2014
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 03/04/2014