Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 12/16/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 12/19/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 01/27/2014
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 02/10/2014
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 02/11/2014
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 02/11/2014
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 02/11/2014
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 02/12/2014
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 02/25/2014
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 03/04/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 03/06/2014
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 03/25/2014