Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC]* 12/13/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 01/27/2014
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 01/29/2014
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 02/24/2014
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/24/2014
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 03/26/2014