Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 12/12/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 12/12/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 12/12/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 12/12/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 12/12/2013
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 12/12/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 12/12/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 12/12/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 12/12/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 12/12/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 12/12/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 12/16/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 12/16/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 01/06/2014
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 01/06/2014
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 01/13/2014
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 03/11/2014