Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 12/11/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 12/11/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 12/11/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND]* 12/11/2013
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 12/11/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 12/11/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 12/11/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 12/12/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 12/16/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 01/07/2014
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 02/24/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 02/24/2014
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 03/12/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 04/10/2014