Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 11/21/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 11/21/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 11/21/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 11/21/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 11/21/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 11/21/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 12/09/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 12/12/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 12/19/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 01/13/2014